Accounts and annual returns THE FORGOTTEN CHILDREN OF CHERNIGOV TRUST
Charity number: 1041637
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 09 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 31 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 17 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | 17 March 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 20 October 2010 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | 20 October 2010 | 50 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window