Financial history KING EDWARD VI GRAMMAR SCHOOL(CHELMSFORD) PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.17k £12.99k £7.55k £10.56k £19.81k
Total expenditure £18.77k £6.53k £11.63k £6.99k £11.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A