Governing document UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 09/08/1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/04/2012 as amended on 09 Mar 2020 as amended on 10 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
3. Objects The Trustees shall hold the capital and income of the Trust Fund upon trust and shall apply the income and all of such part or parts of the capital at such times in such manner as the Trustees in their absolute discretion think fit for the following purposes for the benefit of the public: 3.1 to advance the education of the students at the University by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for potential future students and present students who study (or may want to study) at the University; 3.2 for the public benefit to promote education in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by: 3.2.1 awarding to such persons scholarships, maintenance allowances or grants tenable at the University of Sunderland or such other institutions as the Trustees see fit; and 3.2.2 furthering education by assisting people to prepare for entry to any occupation, trade or profession on leaving any educational establishment; 3.3 to assist and support the University to: 3.3.1 promote the advancement of education including but not limited to the promotion of research and knowledge exchange; and 3.3.2 promote civic engagement in areas of social and economic deprivation.
Area of benefit
UNIVERSITY OF SUNDERLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.