Accounts and annual returns WATERMORE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 November 2024 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 November 2024 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 December 2023 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 02 December 2023 155 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required