WOODSIDE BEREAVEMENT SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 to 1 and group Counselling for adults and/or children who have experienced a bereavement or loss
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £30,840 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Croydon
Governance
- 27 October 1994: Standard registration
- W B S (Working name)
- WBS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE MAVIS CARTER | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Kpodo Atigla | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES THOMAS KING | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Barcellos | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Nicholas | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.41k | £14.91k | £14.39k | £39.38k | £40.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.89k | £11.71k | £19.01k | £21.67k | £26.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.78k | N/A | N/A | £30.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2019 as amended on 11 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON EXPERIENCING SEVERE OR PROLONGED SHOCK OR DEPRESSION ARISING FROM BEREAVEMENT AND LOSS DIVORCE OR ACCIDENT
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
WATERSIDE CENTRE
26 AVENUE ROAD
LONDON
SE25 5DX
- Phone:
- 02032562009
- Email:
- wbs@thelisteningear.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window