RUSKINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HALL IS HIRED BY VARIOUS GROUPS INCLUDING PLAYSCHOOL, BOWLS CLUB, ,SLIMMING CLUB, BINGO, MODEL RAILWAY CLUB AND IS WELL SUPPORTED BY THE COMMUNITY. IT IS ALSO FOR HIRE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC FOR PARTY CELEBRATIONS, MEETINGS, PRIVATE & PROMOTIONAL FUNCTIONS. BLOOD DONOR SESSIONS ARE HELD ON A REGULAR BASIS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 27 October 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Hicks | Chair | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Ashby | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Glover | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Keith Austen | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Nicholas Bamford | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|||||
ALWYN NEIL KIRK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.81k | £16.43k | £18.82k | £17.95k | £24.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.17k | £13.14k | £22.46k | £17.35k | £17.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 April 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19TH JULY 1994
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF RUSKINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF RUSKINGTON IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING PARISHES
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 WESTCLIFFE ROAD
RUSKINGTON
SLEAFORD
NG34 9AX
- Phone:
- 01526 832987
- Email:
- alwynkirk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
info@ruskingtonvillagehall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window