ST. STEPHEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hosts and supports various fund raising groups in their individual activities with the aim of supporting local needs and charitable events. each group selecting their own fund raising activity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,885 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 October 1994: Standard registration
- ST STEPHEN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith William Hugh Wonnacott | Chair | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Jenner | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dan Snook | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Max Venner | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denver Venner | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Allen | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gary Warne | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Warne | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ernestine Joan Patterson | Trustee | 27 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Osborne | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.25k | £12.25k | £49.44k | £113.85k | £51.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.53k | £13.53k | £37.02k | £130.97k | £66.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | £16.74k | £3.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 November 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH MARCH 1990
Charitable objects
(A)TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CIVIL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN-IN-BRANNELL TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B)TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CIVIL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN-IN-BRANNELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Terras Road
St. Stephen
St. Austell
PL26 7RX
- Phone:
- 01726824323
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window