MOUNTSORREL CHURCH OF ENGLAND FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing religion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 28 October 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Winsor | Chair | 28 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JACQUELINE HARRISON | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason Mark G Owen | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Jane Deakin Rowley | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Howard Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Lowe | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Evans | Trustee | 23 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sheila Scott | Trustee | 29 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID BRIAN ALLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ian Kenneth Evans | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jeffrey Scott | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.78k | £238.21k | £237.08k | £262.03k | £135.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.94k | £86.35k | £135.97k | £170.13k | £134.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1ST SEPTEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF MOUNTSORREL ST PETER AND MOUNTSORREL CHRIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES OF MOUNTSORREL CHRIST CHURCH AND MOUNTSORREL ST PETER
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 11158
LEICESTER
LE8 8WH
- Phone:
- 07410 386483
- Email:
- kate@mountsorrelcsf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window