FRIENDS OF CORNWOOD PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"Pre-School" and "Parent, Baby & Toddler Group". To provide opportunities for the social, emotional, physical & intellectual development of all local children under statutory school age whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 28 October 1994: Standard registration
- 30 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1049730 FRIENDS OF CORNWOOD C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
- CORNWOOD & LUTTON PARENT & TODDLERS (Previous name)
- RISING FIVES GROUP (Previous name)
- ROOKIES PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- THE CORNWOOD AND LUTTON UNDER-FIVES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61 | £554 | £66 | £68 | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £498 | £506 | £528 | £426 | £600 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 15 August 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 August 2024 | 442 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 15 August 2024 | 807 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1993, AMENDED 14 SEPTEMBER 1994, 5 APRIL 2001. as amended on 16 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
THE AIM OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF ALL LOCAL CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY: 1. OFFERING APPROPRIATE FACILITIES FOR SUCH ACTIVITIES TO TAKE PLACE. 2. ENCOURAGING PARENTS AND OTHER ADULTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR, AND BECOME INVOLVED IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH ACTIVITIES. 3. OFFERING APPROPRIATE TRAINING FOR ADULTS, OR PROVIDING ACCESS TO TRAINING COURSES. 4. TO BECOME AN INTEGRAL PART OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN CORNWOOD AND LUTTON.
Area of benefit
CORNWOOD AND LUTTON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window