CROSSGATES COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Crossgates Community Centre is available for the community to hire for a variety of activities. The hall comprises of a sports hall, smaller meeting/conference room and kitchen. Regular users hire the hall for weekly craft activities, bowling, badminton, keep fit and youth groups, but it is also available for hire for parties/celebrations and table top sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,837 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynda Wallis | Chair | 30 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Kent | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Coulson | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Leather | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Astling | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Procter | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROY ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS MARY BIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREASURER MRS JAYNE ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.72k | £3.43k | £7.14k | £11.55k | £21.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.46k | £8.15k | £14.58k | £16.86k | £17.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £300 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 6TH JULY 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SEAMER NR SCARBOROUGH NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 GREENFINCH CLOSE
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 4TX
- Phone:
- 01723865771
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window