ST PETER AND ST PAULS' LODGE MASONIC BENEVOLENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
500 GBP donation to Willen Hospice 1000 GBP donation to Air Ambulance 500 GBP donation to Interaction MK 500 GBP donation to The Safety Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 1994: Standard registration
- ST PETER AND ST PAUL'S LODGE MBA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Freeman | Chair | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Freeman | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WILSON BAINES | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.86k | £2.66k | £2.66k | £4.37k | £4.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.18k | £2.77k | £2.76k | £4.43k | £4.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 25 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Elmlea Drive
OLNEY
Buckinghamshire
MK46 5HX
- Phone:
- 07768171021
- Email:
- richard@3shiresgroup.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window