MERCHANT TAYLORS' PREP PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop effective relationships between parents, staff, guardians and governors with the aim of bringing together everyone to enhance and galvanise the community spirit and atmosphere at our School. Actively engage in fund raising activities to provide additional support to enhance the learning for the boys and to help and support local and national charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 04 November 1994: Standard registration
- NORTHWOOD PREP SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- NORTHWOOD PREPARATORY SCHOOL (TERRY'S) PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Samir Patel | Chair | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Arti Badiani | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Khilen Rughani | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Grace Mac | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Wardle | Trustee | 03 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sayeeda Meghji | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deepa Dattani | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rucchi Kamesh | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sonal Patel | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anila Shyam | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fabrica Amaral | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.47k | £13.10k | £12.55k | £12.93k | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.62k | £11.63k | £12.68k | £11.07k | £1.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 307 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 July 2023 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 258 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/2010 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT NORTHWOOD PREP SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merchant Taylors Prep Parents Assoc
Moor Farm
Sandy Lodge Road
RICKMANSWORTH
Hertfordshire
WD3 1LW
- Phone:
- 01923825648
- Email:
- MTPPA@mtpn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window