TILL VALLEY LINK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Till Valley Link in Wiltshire, is a good neighbour scheme helping villagers to maintain their independence. Clients are mostly 60 or over, with help being offered to all age groups. Most clients are in a reasonable state of health. Help is not restricted to persons over sixty - help is offered to all within our local community. All of our members have been CRB checked.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 09 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Miranda Sargent | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Field | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Arthur Pope | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Berry | Trustee | 12 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Angela Mary Webb | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.06k | £1.05k | £3.58k | £2.56k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.62k | £532 | £1.64k | £2.92k | £5.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 27 SEPTEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED ON 14 JULY 2008 as amended on 23 Sep 2019 as amended on 24 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE ANY ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE AREA OF SHREWTON, TILSHEAD, ORCHESTON, WINTERBOURNE STOKE AND BERWICK ST JAMES IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE ORGANISATION SHALL UNDERTAKE SUCH DUTIES FOR THE RELIEF OF THE ELDERLY, THE MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY DISABLED OR OTHER PERSONS IN NEED AS IS DEEMED CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
SHREWTON, TILSHEAD, ORCHESTON, WINTERBOURNE STOKE AND BERWICK ST JAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowlands
Homanton
Shrewton
SALISBURY
SP3 4ER
- Phone:
- 07881627172
- Email:
- practicaljohn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window