YOUTH AND DISABLED WELSH SALMON AND TROUT ANGLING ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ceredigion
- Powys
Governance
- 03 November 1994: Standard registration
- 12 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CYMDEITHAS GENWEIRWYR IFANC AC ANABL EOG A BRITHYLL CYMRU (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2004 | 30/09/2005 | 30/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.70k | £35.12k | £12.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.93k | £33.01k | £15.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN YEARS AND FOR DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window