THE GRAPEVINE CENTRE OF THE SHEFFIELD CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity Number: 1041900
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hiring out rooms; providing community activities for children, youth and seniors.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015

Total income: £6,543
Total expenditure: £6,543

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 November 1994: Standard registration
  • 24 February 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 24 February 2016: Funds transferred to 1159621 SHEFFIELD CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE GRAPEVINE CENTRE (Working name)
  • THE GRAPEVINE CENTRE OF THE HEELEY CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015
Total gross income £8.80k £9.34k £4.48k £7.50k £6.54k
Total expenditure £7.88k £9.34k £5.25k £8.20k £6.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2015 22 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2014 11 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 07 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 02 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required