GAMBLESBY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of meeting place for social and educational community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 03 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Moon | Chair | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Potter | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashley King | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Crumback-Nyahoe | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Chapelhow | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Korner | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Logan | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Sangan | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gordon Henry | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Wales Bell | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Simon Cogan | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mulholland | Trustee | 06 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TRACY POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.18k | £14.79k | £18.98k | £7.06k | £6.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.57k | £10.56k | £5.54k | £11.80k | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 28 JUNE 1991
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GLASSONBY.
Area of benefit
GAMBLESBY AND UNTHANK AND THEIR SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Addingham View
Gamblesby
Penrith
Cumbria
CA10 1JA
- Phone:
- 07872934437
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window