SUPPORT FOR CARERS (SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give Carers weekly respite time thus safeguarding their health and enabling them to continue to care at home. To operate a service that befriends socially isolated people living alone in the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,470 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 03 November 1994: Standard registration
- CARING SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Mellor | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Robinson | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES BUTTERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN TRAFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.84k | £82.40k | £46.85k | £57.34k | £57.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.88k | £48.67k | £53.17k | £60.11k | £65.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £39.20k | £43.81k | £42.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | £42.88k | £50.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 25/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 25/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE, PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) IN THE LOCALITY OF SCARBOROUGH BOROUGH, ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF NEED AND HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4
64-66 LONDESBOROUGH ROAD
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 5AF
- Phone:
- 01723364808
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window