Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST CATHERINE'S CHURCH LUDHAM

Charity number: 1041950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Jonathan Grist Chair 19 October 2021
None on record
Julie Hawes Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Michael Lowenstein Trustee 11 March 2025
None on record
Julia Payn Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Anthony Seymour Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Karen Sahlsberg Trustee 30 July 2024
None on record
Carole June Mathieson Trustee 06 July 2022
None on record
Kenneth John Grapes Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record
PETER DESMOND MILLINGTON WALL Trustee 09 November 2016
None on record
DAVID FROST Trustee 11 August 2013
None on record