THE LIGHT DRAGOONS REGIMENTAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1041982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity exists to provide support to the members and former members of the Regiment and it's antecedent Regiments by way of offering assisstance to those in need, suffering hardship or distress by way of grants, gifts or payments for services or facilities. preserving the traditions of the Regiments and fostering espirit de corps within the serving Regiment and the Regimental Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £171,652
Total expenditure: £235,158

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 May 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE LIGHT DRAGOONS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dan Lenherr Trustee 19 September 2024
None on record
Harry Chrisp Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
MICHAEL REED Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Samuel Plant Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
Colonel Hannah Stoy Trustee 01 May 2022
None on record
jeremy robert barkes Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
HARRY PATRICK OGDEN Trustee 02 August 2016
None on record
NICHOLAS MILNE Trustee 09 May 2015
CHARNEY BASSETT AND LYFORD EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
RICHARD CHARLES RENWICK Trustee 12 May 2014
None on record
EDWARD THOMAS LEGARD Trustee 06 November 2013
None on record
CHARLES FRYER SEABOURNE MAY Trustee 15 July 2013
None on record
WILLIAM GURTH PETO Trustee 15 July 2013
None on record
COLONEL HENRY ANGUS WATSON Trustee 10 May 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £193.49k £190.69k £170.34k £205.34k £171.65k
Total expenditure £267.91k £499.93k £244.17k £262.85k £235.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 15 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DATED 07/02/2011
Charitable objects
ASSISTING PERSONS WHO ARE CURRENTLY OR WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE LIGHT DRAGOONS REGIMENT ON OPERATIONAL TOURS CONDUCTED SINCE 1992 AND THEIR DEPENDANTS BY PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THE HEALTH OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN WOUNDED OR INJURED WHILST SERVING IN THE LIGHT DRAGOONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES EQUIPMENT OR SERVICES FOR THEIR REHABILITATION AND MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES WHO ASSIST MEMBERS OF THE LIGHT DRAGOONS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS AND; RELIEVING SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE LIGHT DRAGOONS REGIMENT WHO HAVE SERVED ON OPERATIONAL TOURS CONDUCTED SINCE 1992 AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH OR THEIR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 19 May 2011 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
HOME HEADQUARTERS
THE LIGHT DRAGOONS
FENHAM BARRACKS
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 4NP
Phone:
01912393138