Financial history VOLUNTEER CENTRE BATH & NORTH EAST SOMERSET

Charity number: 1042007
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £46.64k £74.41k £44.76k £55.31k £47.40k
Total expenditure £53.04k £50.59k £54.22k £43.33k £57.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £18.00k £18.00k £30.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0