THE SHOREHAM ORATORIO CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's principal activities are the once-a-week rehearsals in preparation for and the giving of public performances of major classic choral works on three occasions, normally Christmas and Easter and summer, every year. Occasionally, concerts support fundraising appeals by other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin J Gilroy | Chair | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Graham Bridgens | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Howden | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Alexandra Galloway | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Philippa Keys | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Stringer | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET GILLIAN KENT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hilary Newman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.55k | £1.88k | £10.77k | £15.04k | £15.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.67k | £4.58k | £14.34k | £12.51k | £14.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED 30 SEPTEMBER 1993 AND 6 OCTOBER 1994 as amended on 24 Feb 2022 as amended on 13 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE WEST SUSSEX AND EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 The Lynchetts
SHOREHAM-BY-SEA
West Sussex
BN43 5GZ
- Phone:
- 01273249604
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window