SEDGEFIELD AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To organise an annual show to present aspects of farming, rural economy & pursuits to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 09 November 1994: Standard registration
- SEDGEFIELD SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Downs | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Martin | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas William Etherington | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin McKenzie | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Craggs | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HAWKINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.53k | £2.72k | £3.09k | £54.13k | £55.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.68k | £6.69k | £8.35k | £44.31k | £45.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2022 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 09 March 2021 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 09 March 2021 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
(A) TO IMPROVE AGRICULTURAL FORESTRY, HORTICULTURE, ALLIED INDUSTRIES, RURAL CRAFTS AND THE BREEDING OF LIVESTOCK (B) TO DEMONSTRATE IMPROVED METHODS AND PROCESSES CONNECTED WITH THE ABOVE (C) TO HOLD IN PURSUANCE OF ITS MAIN OBJECT AN AGRICULTURAL SHOW
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE-THE VILLAGE OF SEDGEFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF DURHAM AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merton Grange
Stillington
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS21 1NJ
- Phone:
- 07814233302
- Email:
- claire@sedgefieldshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window