DR JOE JAFFE HOSPITAL SUPPORT CHARITY

Charity number: 1042019
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hospital support charity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £15,301
Total expenditure: £19,139

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. It works with commercial participators with an agreement in place.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments and/or benefits from the charity for being a trustee

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Lancashire
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 November 1994: Standard registration
  • 10 August 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £59.48k £39.54k £25.70k £32.98k £15.30k
Total expenditure £61.25k £47.48k £43.27k £26.29k £19.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 20 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 20 November 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 20 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 20 November 2013 On Time