Financial history THE CORNERSTONE GROUP

Charity number: 1042026
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2013 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017
Total gross income £38.51k £30.06k £37.27k £33.86k £36.92k
Total expenditure £40.16k £24.33k £34.34k £36.03k £41.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0