Financial history THE MINSTER CENTRE

Charity number: 1042052
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.50m £1.56m £2.55m £1.70m £1.80m
Total expenditure £1.51m £1.59m £2.53m £1.74m £1.90m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.97k £2.15k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £255 £0 £13.48k £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.50m £1.56m £2.54m £1.69m £1.79m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.78k £1.75k £1.33k £6.70k £13.04k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.59m £2.53m £1.74m £1.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.35k £11.76k £11.97k £13.17k £14.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0