Accounts and annual returns ESSEX POLICE MUSEUM

Charity number: 1042055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2024 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 March 2023 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 May 2021 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required