ESSEX POLICE MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training. The museum is established to show how the Essex Police developed from its inception since 1840 until the present time. This is provided by access to the collection by the public when the museum is open and also by special arrangement. Education via the school curriculum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 15 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iain Henry Campbell Logan | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jack Williamson | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Liam Osborne | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Walters | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Hooper QPM | Trustee | 17 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Robert Stokes | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cook | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.87k | £11.62k | £25.80k | £22.96k | £8.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.28k | £1.02k | £3.48k | £20.16k | £713 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 May 2021 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 SEP 1994 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 19 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF ESSEX POLICE SERVICE IN PARTICULAR BY COLLECTING PRESERVING INTERPRETING AND DOCUMENTING MATERIAL EVIDENCE AND ASSOCIATED INFORMATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE MAINTAINANCE OF A MUSEUM FOR ITEMS OF HISTORIC POLICE INTEREST AND THE DISPLAY AND DEMONSTRATION OF SUCH ITEMS AND THE MEANS WHEREBY SO TO DO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ESSEX POLICE MUSEUM
KINGSTON CRESCENT
CM2 6DN
- Phone:
- 01245457150
- Email:
- museum@essex.pnn.police.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window