THE RAPTOR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A rescue and rehabilitation centre for wild native birds of prey. Providing education, conservational talks, flying displays and close encounters with the birds of prey to public visiting and Outreach sessions to schools and clubs, bird groups about the work we do. Offering volunteer/ work experience opportunities to schools and high educational pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 15 November 1994: Standard registration
- RAMSEY RAPTOR RESCUE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Mark Wesson | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL MUNRO HIRST | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.26k | £379.11k | £353.24k | £322.03k | £335.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £309.67k | £310.02k | £382.32k | £409.22k | £352.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.78k | £172.54k | £4.37k | £1.42k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1)THE RESCUE AND CARE FOR SICK OR INJURED BIRDS OF PREY 2)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY RESEARCH INTO THE CARE AND REHABILITATION OF BIRDS OF PREY AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HEATH
ST IVES ROAD
WOODHURST
CAMBS
PE28 3BT
- Phone:
- 01487741140
- Email:
- info@raptorfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.