Accounts and annual returns OXFORD UNIVERSITY OFFICER TRAINING CORP CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1042097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 21 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 May 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 17 August 2021 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 17 August 2021 139 days late Download Open in new window