Financial history FRIENDS OF FLEGGBURGH SCHOOL

Charity number: 1042102
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/09/2019 17/09/2020 17/09/2021 17/09/2022 17/09/2023
Total gross income £1.93k £341 £534 £2.72k £3.35k
Total expenditure £3.12k £1.16k £69 £1.19k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A