ST. MARY'S OSTERLEY PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playgroup offers young children the opportunity to learn through play according to their individual needs, in a happy, stable and caring environment with opportunities for exploration and discovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 October 2024
Total income includes £91,081 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hounslow
Governance
- 16 December 1994: Standard registration
- 13 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 02/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.46k | £103.17k | £110.22k | £57.08k | £99.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.27k | £102.71k | £110.97k | £102.42k | £111.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £99.33k | £84.09k | £82.61k | £53.72k | £91.08k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 October 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 October 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/2013 as amended on 20 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window