Governing document SOUTHERN UNIVERSITIES MANAGEMENT SERVICES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/2011 as amended on 06 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ADMINISTRATION OF EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES IN DIRECT PURSUIT OF THEIR OBJECTS BY (A) ADVICE, TRAINING AND INFORMATION ABOUT FINANCIAL PLANNING, EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT PROCEDURES AND THE BEST USE OF AVAILABLE RESOURCES, AND (B) ANY OTHER ASSISTANCE APPROPRIATE TO THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL PLANNING, PROCEDURAL ADVICE AND RESOURCE MANAGEMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.