THE DERBY AND SANDIACRE CANAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work with the local community to restore the former Derby Canal as a navigable waterway from Sandiacre to Swarkestone via Derby as close as possible to the original route, creating a cruising ring and reconnecting Derby to the national canal network maximising the sustainable economic, job creation, environmental, nature conservancy, leisure, heritage and educational benefits for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 21 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Richardson | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mike Wingfield | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Miller | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
William David Savidge | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher ReesFitzpatrick | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Robert MICHAEL SNAITH | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL NICHOLAS HORTON-TURNER | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM JOHN MADGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £128.60k | £355.35k | £335.74k | £75.41k | £139.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.54k | £234.38k | £163.22k | £99.09k | £112.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £78.58k | £3.71k | £56.92k | £1.27k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 March 2022 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 10 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION TO GOOD AND NAVIGABLE ORDER OF AS MUCH AS IS CONSIDERED POSSIBLE OF THE DERBY AND SANDIACRE CANAL (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE WATERWAY) AND TO MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE WATERWAY FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND (NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE WATERWAY SHALL INCLUDE ALL OTHER LAND, WATERWAYS, BUILDINGS, STRUCTURES AND WORKS ASSOCIATED WITH THE WATERWAY.FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 BROADWAY
DUFFIELD
BELPER
DE56 4BU
- Phone:
- 07827946444
- Email:
- info@derbycanal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window