Financial history BAZME CHISTIYA

Charity number: 1042231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £40.14k £85.88k £50.45k £49.57k £75.82k
Total expenditure £32.52k £60.84k £55.99k £38.95k £45.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A