STIVICHALL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1042260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To raise funds to be spent on improving equipment and resources to enhance the education of the children and the facilities of Stivichall Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £14,555
Total expenditure: £4,183

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • STIVICHALL PRIMARY SCHOOL P T A (Working name)
  • STIVICHALL PTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amie Waters Chair 13 November 2024
None on record
Subaigh Prem Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Sarah Biggs Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Matthew Waters Trustee 13 November 2024
None on record
Jane Helen Rebecca Gardner Trustee 20 September 2023
None on record
James Gilhooly Trustee 14 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £18.16k £39.32k £5.20k £16.15k £14.56k
Total expenditure £27.20k £10.06k £37.54k £12.83k £4.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 17 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 03 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PTA TREASURER
Stivichall Primary School
Coat of Arms Bridge Road
COVENTRY
CV3 6PY
Phone:
024 7641 9555
Website:

No information available