AL-NASR

Charity number: 1042265
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Practical help to the community on drug abuse, women issues, liaison with Police Authorities on potential extremism in the community, Community hours for offenders through Probation Service, Advice to immigration and foreign students on British culture, Mother and Toddlers drop in centre, Advice to non Muslim who may have problems with their Muslim partner. Information and library service re Islam

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,133
Total expenditure: £3,559

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • AL-NASR CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT FAROOQ Chair 12 November 1994
None on record
Haris Mehar Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
TAHIRA QURESHI Trustee 19 July 2012
None on record
FARHAT MALIK Trustee 19 July 2012
None on record
FAROOQ SIDDIQI Trustee 09 August 2011
None on record
KHALID MEHAR Trustee 12 November 1994
None on record
ABDULLAH MAS'UD Trustee
None on record
Dr Abdul Ali A HAMID MA, PHD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £70 £200 £100 £895 £4.13k
Total expenditure £19 £154 £80 £810 £3.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ANSAR BUILDING
1st Floor
147 St Pauls Ave
Slough
SL2 5EN
Phone:
01753550788
Website:

al-nasr.org