SNAP Specialist Playgroup

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SNAP specialist play is based in Pembrokeshire supporting pre school age children who have additional needs. The children's developmental milestones are observed, assessed and identified where individual play plans are devised to support their progress through play . We work collaboratively with all professionals involved to assist the transition into Education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,655 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 23 November 1994: Standard registration
- SNAP (Working name)
- SPECIAL NEEDS ASSESSMENT PLAYGROUP (HAVERFORDWEST) (Previous name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr VIPUL VIPULENDRAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
sara john | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
ALISON TUDOR | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Martin Simmonds | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Gillian Hill | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|||||
BARBARA WALTERS | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.69k | £112.64k | £140.54k | £63.14k | £122.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.01k | £111.41k | £139.41k | £73.86k | £110.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £123.30k | N/A | £30.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £73.08k | N/A | N/A | £24.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 25/11/2003 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUL 2017 as amended on 10 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN WALES BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SNAP SPECIALIST PLAYGROUP CHILD HEATH DEPARTMENT
WITHYBUSH HOSPITAL
FISHGUARD ROAD
Haverfordwest
Dyfed
SA61 2PZ
- Phone:
- 07990875081
- Email:
- snap.pembrokeshire@live.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window