Financial history NUNEATON AND HINCKLEY CATS IN NEED

Charity number: 1042283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.18k £4.73k £4.57k £2.12k £608
Total expenditure £9.16k £7.56k £8.60k £4.80k £2.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A