BERKSHIRE CARERS SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Berkshire Carers Service provides grants to organisations for specific projects that support local carers' needs and improve the sustainability of services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 25 November 1994: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- PRINCESS ROYAL TRUST CARERS SERVICE (Working name)
- PRT CARERS SERVICE (Previous name)
- READING CARERS NETWORK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £529.30k | £539.65k | £1.65k | £184 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £641.06k | £625.12k | £52.29k | £55.03k | £20.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £351.97k | £373.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £155.49k | £153.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £525.69k | £1.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.91k | £1.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £534.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.71k | £1.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £606.57k | £623.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £1.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £32.60k | £35.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £376 | £144 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 27 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 15 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 22 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 17 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 17 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/10/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF THE SICK AND DISABLED BE ASSISTING TO RELIEVE AND ALLEVIATE ALL KINDS OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THEIR CARERS AND DEPENDENTS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONG CARERS AND THE PUBLIC. 3) TO RELIEVE THE SICKNESS OF FORMER CARERS
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window