THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH ALVERSTOKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Friends of St. Mary's Church Alverstoke shall be to raise funds as necessary to maintain, repair,preserve, improve, beautify and reconstruct for the benefit of the public the fabric of the Church of St. Mary Alverstoke in monuments, fixtures, fittings, jurniture, stained glass, ornaments and other chattels and its churchyard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 23 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert William Hamilton | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Elaine Marsden | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Robert Lock | Trustee | 17 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Anne Edge | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Carol Morgan | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANNE WORKMAN | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.99k | £7.70k | £5.54k | £6.82k | £6.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £2.79k | £2.92k | £3.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. MARY ALVERSTOKE, ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE - ST. MARY'S CHURCH ALVERSTOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Church Parish Centre
Green Road
GOSPORT
Hampshire
PO12 2ET
- Phone:
- 02392580551
- Email:
- peter.ford@alverstoke.church
- Website:
-
stmarysalverstoke.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window