FAMILY'S 'N' FRIENDS MISSING PERSONS AGENCY AND A D P A S
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aged and disabled persons action support. Missing persons agency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 November 1994: Standard registration
- 01 May 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FAMILY'S 'N' FRIENDS MISSING PERSONS AGENCY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360 | £360 | £180 | £120 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £360 | £360 | £180 | £120 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 23 March 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 15 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE- (1)THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF FAMILIES AND RELATIVES OF MISSING PERSONS; (2)AGED AND DISABLED PERSONS IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE TRANSPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window