Financial history DRIGG AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 1042348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.82k £504 £9.91k £19.31k £22.36k
Total expenditure £8.86k £524 £9.55k £20.79k £19.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A