Trustees THE ELISHA SMITH INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1042374

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ELIZABETH SALMON | Chair | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Robert Turner | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kevin Bull | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Thornewill Miller | Trustee | 18 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Amy Thompson | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Henderson | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oliver William John Lincoln | Trustee | 18 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bond | Trustee | 01 March 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.