HILLINGDON AIDS RESPONSE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide information,support and advice to all men,women and children affected by HIV and AIDS who live primarily within the London Borough of Hillingdon. Hart aims to produce a range of services either directly from our staff and volunteers or by referral to other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 17 December 1994: Standard registration
- H A R T (Working name)
- HART (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Garry John Cooper | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wezi Thamm | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eve Lawino Abe | Trustee | 16 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Eileen Preston | Trustee | 16 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER ALLAN CURLING | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SALLY NUNN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.92k | £46.05k | £37.21k | £41.11k | £40.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.26k | £42.95k | £44.83k | £46.21k | £47.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 1 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HILLINGDON ESPECIALLY THOSE INHABITANTS WITH ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) INFECTION ILLNESS AND RELATED CONDITIONS CAUSED BY HUMAN IMMUNO-DEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) OR OTHER CAUSATIVE AGENTS BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING ADVICE AND OTHER FORMS OF SUPPORT
Area of benefit
HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 NEW WINDSOR STREET
UXBRIDGE
UB8 2TU
- Phone:
- 01895813874
- Email:
- hartlbh@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window