BRIGHTON KI SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of public education and the protection and preservation of good health of the public by the provision of education and training in Ki and Mind and Body Unification.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 November 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MACFARLAND BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Claire Nicola Johnson | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Patton | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.94k | £42.25k | £21.23k | £19.12k | £19.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.29k | £21.71k | £22.40k | £20.27k | £24.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £19.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED 19 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN KI MIND AND BODY UNIFICATION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 CLIFTON STREET
BRIGHTON
BN1 3PG
- Phone:
- 07769588938
- Email:
- brighton@kisociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window