Financial history TIME TO TALK (ELY)

Charity number: 1042459
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2004 30/11/2005 30/11/2006 30/11/2007 30/11/2008
Total gross income £17.08k £2.52k £21.67k £7.22k £5.47k
Total expenditure £23.35k £6.82k £8.90k £14.90k £12.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A