Financial history NORTH LONDON TRAINING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1042477
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.00k £24.50k £50.00k £9.99k £24.00k
Total expenditure £21.49k £20.97k £44.10k £8.50k £23.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A