NORTH LONDON TRAINING TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 December 1994: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oladapo Abideen Agboola | Chair | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Wilcox | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olanrewaju Yekinni | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £24.50k | £50.00k | £9.99k | £24.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.49k | £20.97k | £44.10k | £8.50k | £23.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 February 2025 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 February 2023 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ADVICE AND TRAINING ON THE SETTING UP AND RUNNING OF SMALL BUSINESS TO PEOPLE IN NEED OF SUCH ADVICE AND TRAINING BECAUSE OF THEIR POVERTY OR LACK OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 8
Living Building
3 Sherman Road
BROMLEY
BR1 3JH
- Phone:
- 02086912200
- Email:
- info@nltt.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window