Governance NORTH LONDON TRAINING TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1042477
Up to date
Registration history:
- 03 December 1994: Standard registration
- 27 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 October 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.