GRANGE COMMUNITY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it. Organise fund-raising activities for the provision of such facilities or items for education at the school (not provided from statutory funds)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 December 1994: Standard registration
- GRANGE COMMUNITY JUNIOR PTA (Working name)
- GRANGE COMMUNITY JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- FARNBOROUGH GRANGE COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCAITION (Previous name)
- FARNBOROUGH GRANGE COUNTY JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNETTE VODDEN | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £6.02k | £0 | £3.27k | £4.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.28k | £9.39k | £0 | £1.67k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 May 2023 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Grange Community Junior School
Wren Way
Farnborough
GU14 8TA
- Phone:
- 01252542196
- Email:
- sianthorne@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window